Global Patent Index - EP 0964774 B1

EP 0964774 B1 2001-05-30 - HEATED CUTTING INSTRUMENT

Title (en)

HEATED CUTTING INSTRUMENT

Title (de)

BEHEIZTES SCHNEIDINSTRUMENT

Title (fr)

INSTRUMENT DE COUPE CHAUFFE

Publication

EP 0964774 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966523 A

Priority

  • DE 9803630 W
  • DE 19754253 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9929476A1] Heated cutting instruments are used in particular in the hairdressing field for cauterising and cutting hair. The previously known heated cutting instruments are fitted with exposed or only inadequately covered heating elements. Such cutting instruments are unsatisfactory or even questionable as regards hygiene and safety. The new heated cutting instrument is meant to improve safety and handling of such scissors. The disclosed heated cutting instrument (1) has at least one blade (2) with a recess (11) for receiving a heating element (12). The heating element (12) is entirely enclosed by the blade (2) and is therefore not accessible from the outside. The energy efficiency, heat distribution and safety of the cutting instrument (1) are thus considerably improved. Moreover, its handling is improved by the complete encapsulation of all current-conducting parts. The invention is useful in the field of hairdressing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 13/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/24 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9929476 A1 19990617; AT 201626 T 20010615; DE 19754253 C1 19990909; EP 0964774 A1 19991222; EP 0964774 B1 20010530; JP 2001511051 A 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051205

2003-10-10 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-09-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030901

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-07-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011231

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-12-05 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-11-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-08-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FIAMMENGHI - DOMENIGHETTI

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800793 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2001-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201626 T 20010615

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000316

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990724

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL