Global Patent Index - EP 0964793 B1

EP 0964793 B1 2003-06-11 - DRAWING OR PAINTING BOARD

Title (en)

DRAWING OR PAINTING BOARD

Title (de)

ZEICHEN- ODER MALPLATTE

Title (fr)

PLANCHE POUR LE DESSIN OU LA PEINTURE

Publication

EP 0964793 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97953667 A

Priority

  • DE 9703008 W
  • DE 19706178 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19706178A1] The invention relates to a drawing or painting board, in particular for children, with a substructure onto which the board is fastened. A bar (4, 16) is removably attached to the substructure. In the rear edge area (13) of the board (1), the bar (4, 16) is fitted in parallel direction to said edge. A roll (6, 17), from which a flexible strip-like material (7, 18) can be pulled, is rotationally fixed to the bar (4, 16), and the end of the length of material (7, 18) is guided over the board (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 5/02; A47D 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47D 3/00 (2006.01); B43L 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47D 3/00 (2013.01); B43L 5/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19706178 A1 19980820; AT 242702 T 20030615; EP 0964793 A1 19991222; EP 0964793 B1 20030611; WO 9835839 A1 19980820

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071219

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051116

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *EICHINGER HARTMUT

- Effective date: 20031231

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710285 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990917

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE FR IT NL