Global Patent Index - EP 0964924 A4

EP 0964924 A4 2001-04-18 - IRON REGULATED PROMOTER AND USES THEREOF

Title (en)

IRON REGULATED PROMOTER AND USES THEREOF

Title (de)

EISEN-REGULIERTER PROMOTOR UND SEINE VERWENDUNGEN.

Title (fr)

PROMOTEUR REGULE PAR DU FER ET SON EMPLOI

Publication

EP 0964924 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97933590 A

Priority

  • AU 9700503 W
  • AU PO216496 A
  • AU PO245496 A
  • AU PO780197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9810064A1] The present invention provides an iron-regulated promoter. The promoter comprises the DNA sequence (shown in the figure), or a fragment thereof which includes the sequence from residues 284 to 409, or a functionally equivalent nucleic acid sequence. Also provided are vectors and recombinant host cells including the promoter and compositions for use in inducing an immune response in an animal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/11; C12N 15/70; C12N 15/74; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/112

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/435 (2006.01); C12N 15/74 (2006.01); C12N 15/90 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4354 (2013.01); C12N 15/74 (2013.01); C12N 15/90 (2013.01); A61K 39/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/51 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9419482 A1 19940901 - GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al
  • [T] US 5747028 A 19980505 - CALDERWOOD STEPHEN B [US], et al
  • [X] DATABASE EMBL EMBL; 16 July 1988 (1988-07-16), BINDEREIF AND NEILANDS: "Plasmid ColIV-K30 (E. coli) aerobactin operon, promoter region", XP002159818
  • [X] BRICKMAN ET AL.: "Regulation of divergent transcription from the iron-responsive fepB-entC promoter-operator regions in Escherichia coli", J MOL BIOL, vol. 212, no. 4, 20 April 1990 (1990-04-20), pages 669 - 682, XP000983201
  • [X] SU ET AL.: "Extracellular export of Shiga toxin B-subunit/haemolysin A (C-terminus) fusion protein expressed in Salmonella typhimurium", MICROB PATHOG, vol. 13, no. 6, December 1992 (1992-12-01), pages 465 - 476, XP000983124
  • [X] SU ET AL.: "Construction of stable LamB-Shiga toxin B subunit hybrids: analysis of expression in Salmonella typhimurium aroA strains and stimulation of B subunit-specific mucosal and serum antibody responses", INFECT IMMUN, vol. 60, no. 8, August 1992 (1992-08-01), pages 3345 - 3359, XP000983213
  • See also references of WO 9810064A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9810064 A1 19980312; AR 008171 A1 19991209; BR 9711692 A 20001024; CA 2265883 A1 19980312; EP 0964924 A1 19991222; EP 0964924 A4 20010418; NZ 334649 A 20000825

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031219

2003-09-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030808

2001-04-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE