Global Patent Index - EP 0964965 B1

EP 0964965 B1 2001-01-24 - SEWER PIPE

Title (en)

SEWER PIPE

Title (de)

ABWASSERKANAL

Title (fr)

TUYAU D'EGOUT

Publication

EP 0964965 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 98908307 A

Priority

  • NL 9800107 W
  • NL 1005336 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9837282A1] The invention relates to a pipe suitable for use in a sewage system made from concrete and to be coupled with other pipes of the same type for the construction of a sewage system, and provided with a seamless inside wall, having rising side wall elements (9, 10) which in a cross-sectional view taper towards the bottom of the pipe and extend in a substantially straight course, which side wall elements merge into one another at the bottom side of the pipe to form a curved wall portion whose curve is defined by a first radius (11), and which at the top side of the pipe merge into one another to from a curved wall portion whose curve is defined by a second radius (12), the second radius being larger than the first radius. The first radius is more or less constant and small and independent of the second radius, and the inclination of the side wall elements with respect to a horizontal base is fixed at a constant value which is independent of the second radius.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03F 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03F 3/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB LU NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9837282 A1 19980827; AU 6636998 A 19980909; DE 69800509 D1 20010301; DE 69800509 T2 20010613; EP 0964965 A1 19991222; EP 0964965 B1 20010124; NL 1005336 C2 19980824

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-02 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *WACO-LIESBOSCH BETON B.V.

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070901

2006-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060223

2006-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060424

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-28 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-02-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060223

2006-02-21 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-21 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-15 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20050215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-01-12 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-03-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69800509 20010301

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB LU NL

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000717

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990816

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB LU NL