Global Patent Index - EP 0965070 B1

EP 0965070 B1 2000-10-11 - PRINTER AND COPIER FOR PERFORMANCE-ADJUSTED MONOCHROME AND/OR COLOUR PRINTING ON ONE OR BOTH SIDES OF RECORDING MEDIUM

Title (en)

PRINTER AND COPIER FOR PERFORMANCE-ADJUSTED MONOCHROME AND/OR COLOUR PRINTING ON ONE OR BOTH SIDES OF RECORDING MEDIUM

Title (de)

DRUCK- UND KOPIERGERÄT ZUM PERFORMANCE-ANGEPASSTEN, MONOCHROMEN UND/ODER FARBIGEN, EIN- ODER BEIDSEITIGEN BEDRUCKEN EINES AUFZEICHNUNGSTRÄGERS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'IMPRESSION ET DE COPIE POUR REALISER UNE IMPRESSION MONOCHROME OU EN COULEURS, ADAPTEE A DES PERFORMANCES, SUR UN OU DEUX COTES D'UN SUPPORT

Publication

EP 0965070 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951100 A

Priority

  • DE 9702795 W
  • DE 19708515 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839691A1] The invention relates to a printing or copying apparatus for performance-adjusted monochrome or colour printing on one or both sides of a recording medium. On both sides of a transport channel (11) said apparatus has an electrophotography module (E1, E2) with an endless photoconductor (13) and a transfer module (T1, T2) with an endless transfer ribbon (19). A control device (ST) controls the electrophotography modules (E1, E2), transfer modules (T1, T2) and transport device (38) in such a way that, in a collective state, colour-separated toner images are serially transferred from the electrophotography module to the transfer ribbon (19). The collective toner image generated in this way is transferred to the recording medium in a start-stop operation. In a continuous operating state assigned to monochrome printing, individual toner images are transferred directly from the electrophotography module via the transfer module to the recording medium (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/23

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 21/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/00 (2006.01); G03G 15/01 (2006.01); G03G 15/16 (2006.01); G03G 15/20 (2006.01); G03G 15/23 (2006.01); G03G 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/231 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839691 A1 19980911; CA 2282846 A1 19980911; CA 2282846 C 20070515; CN 1115608 C 20030723; CN 1245566 A 20000223; EP 0965070 A1 19991222; EP 0965070 B1 20001011; JP 2001513910 A 20010904; JP 4347912 B2 20091021; US 6246856 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702478

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121128

2013-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OCE PRINTING SYSTEMS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702478 20001116

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000315

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990913

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB