Global Patent Index - EP 0965249 B1

EP 0965249 B1 2001-05-02 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE RECTIFICATION EFFECT OCCURRiNG IN A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE RECTIFICATION EFFECT OCCURRiNG IN A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN DES IN EINER GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE AUFTRETENDEN GLEICHRICHTEFFEKTS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DETECTION DE L'EFFET DE REDRESSEMENT DANS UNE LAMPE A DECHARGE

Publication

EP 0965249 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98912300 A

Priority

  • DE 19708792 A
  • EP 9800791 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19708792A1] The invention relates to a method for detecting the rectification effect in at least one gas discharge lamp (10) and to an electronic ballast operating at least one gas discharge lamp (10) detecting the occurrence of said effect therein. The current (i1) flowing through a primary winding (7A) of a heat transformer (7A-C) which is parallel connected to the gas discharge lamp (10) or a variable (i2, u3) dependent upon said current (i1) is monitored in order to provide high-sensitivity detection of the rectification effect occurring in the gas discharge lamp (10). Cut-off results when a predetermined limit is exceeded upon occurrence of the rectification effect in said gas discharge lamp (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/298

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/298 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2985 (2013.01); Y10S 315/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19708792 A1 19980910; AT 200950 T 20010515; AU 6719598 A 19980922; AU 721988 B2 20000720; BR 9808165 A 20000516; BR 9808165 B1 20120222; EP 0965249 A1 19991222; EP 0965249 B1 20010502; US 6140771 A 20001031; WO 9839948 A1 19980911

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170212

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-11-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800669

- Effective date: 20140902

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140212

2014-09-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800669

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130212

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 200950 T

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130429

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20120224

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH

- Free text: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT)

2007-02-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-06-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800669 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-05-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200950 T 20010515

2000-05-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000414

2000-05-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 05B 41/298 A

2000-05-10 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE RECTIFICATION EFFECT OCCURRING IN A GAS DISCHARGE LAMP

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE