Global Patent Index - EP 0965251 B1

EP 0965251 B1 2001-05-02 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF GAS DISCHARGE LAMPS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE OPERATION OF GAS DISCHARGE LAMPS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM REGELN DES BETRIEBSVERHALTENS VON GASENTLADUNGSLAMPEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REGULER LE FONCTIONNEMENT DES LAMPES A DECHARGE GAZEUSE

Publication

EP 0965251 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98909447 A

Priority

  • DE 19708783 A
  • EP 9800773 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839950A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for controlling the operation of at least one gas discharge lamp (10), by means of a control unit (1). The proportional component of said control unit is set according to an externally determined control value (SOLL) of an operating parameter of said gas discharge lamp (10). Said control value (SOLL) relates especially to the desired brightness of said gas discharge lamp (10). The proportional component of the control unit (1) is set at high for low brightness control values and at low for high brightness control values of the gas discharge lamp (10). In this way said gas discharge lamp (10) can be lit reliably without a light flash even at low brightness values and instabilities at high brightness values can be avoided at the same time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/3921 (2013.01); H05B 41/3925 (2013.01); Y10S 315/04 (2013.01); Y10S 315/07 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839950 A1 19980911; AT 200951 T 20010515; AU 6397798 A 19980922; AU 721846 B2 20000713; BR 9808168 A 20000516; BR 9808168 B1 20110531; DE 19708783 C1 19981008; EP 0965251 A1 19991222; EP 0965251 B1 20010502; US 6316886 B1 20011113

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170211

2017-10-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170211

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800670

2014-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140211

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140430

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130211

2013-11-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-09-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120312

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110211

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110222

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-11-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080901

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH

- Free text: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#SCHMELZHUETTERSTRASSE 34#6850 DORNBIRN (AT)

2007-02-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-04-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011130

2001-08-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-08-02 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010802

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800670 20010607

2001-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-05-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200951 T 20010515

2000-10-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000414

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990809

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE