Global Patent Index - EP 0965253 B1

EP 0965253 B1 2003-06-11 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING PLASMA

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING PLASMA

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES PLASMAS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UN PLASMA

Publication

EP 0965253 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98905135 A

Priority

  • AT 9800048 W
  • AT 36897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9839953A1] The invention relates to a device for producing RF/HF induced low-energy plasma (17), in particular noble gas plasma, comprising a generator and a supply element for the plasma gas. The invention provides for the generator to be coupled in a known manner to two particularly ring- or disk-shaped two parallel, interspaced electrodes (1), each having at least one through-opening, and for at least one isolator (2) to be positioned between said electrodes (1), said isolator having at least one particularly circular through-opening (3) assigned to the through-opening of the electrode, whose through-opening (3) is designed to confine the plasma (17) formed by a plasma gas at a pressure of at least 0.01 bars but preferably between 0.1 and 5 bars. The inside diameter of the through-opening (4) of the electrodes (1) is at least double but especially approximately four to eight times that of the inside diameter of the through-opening (3) in the isolator (2) for confining the plasma (17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05H 1/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/30 (2006.01); H05H 1/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05H 1/30 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3431 (2013.01); H05H 2001/3478 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9839953 A1 19980911; AT 405472 B 19990825; AT A36897 A 19981215; AU 6080998 A 19980922; AU 743870 B2 20020207; CA 2283410 A1 19980911; CA 2283410 C 20021112; DE 59808697 D1 20030717; EP 0965253 A1 19991222; EP 0965253 B1 20030611; US 6169370 B1 20010102

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2007-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070925

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2003-12-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808697 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-11 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020502

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991004

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT