Global Patent Index - EP 0965284 A4

EP 0965284 A4 2000-11-14 - COTTON (TOWEL) BAG LINED WITH NON TRANSPIRABLE MATERIAL

Title (en)

COTTON (TOWEL) BAG LINED WITH NON TRANSPIRABLE MATERIAL

Title (de)

TASCHE AUS BAUMWOLLE (TUCH) MIT EINER NICHTATMUNGSAKTIVER AUSKLEIDUNG

Title (fr)

SAC EN COTON (SERVIETTE) DOUBLE DE MATERIAU NON RESPIRANT

Publication

EP 0965284 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98904176 A

Priority

  • ES 9800041 W
  • ES 9700565 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965284A1] Cotton(towel) handbag, lined with non transpirable material, comprised of two materials, principally: a cotton(towel) external part(1) and non transpirable material internal part(2) which, can reinforce partially or totally the external side adhered to the cotton(towel)(1). The non transpirable material (2), can be plastified by heating, sealing, sewing or adhesion through industrial process in order to form a single piece(1 and 2). The non transpirable material (2) can also be joined to(1) by other systems(magnets, clips, etc.), thereby providing for two possibilities to use said handbag; with or without lining. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 3/06; A45C 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 3/00 (2006.01); A45C 3/04 (2006.01); A45C 3/06 (2006.01); A45C 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 3/00 (2013.01); A45C 3/04 (2013.01); A45C 3/06 (2013.01); A45C 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI MC PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965284 A1 19991222; EP 0965284 A4 20001114; AU 6215498 A 19980922; ES 1036609 U 19971001; ES 1036609 Y 19980301; WO 9838884 A1 19980911

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020510

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010917

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990506

2000-11-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

2000-11-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI MC PT

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI MC PT