Global Patent Index - EP 0965291 A3

EP 0965291 A3 2001-02-14 - Chair with adjustable back rest

Title (en)

Chair with adjustable back rest

Title (de)

Stuhl mit verstellbarer Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Chaise avec dossier réglable

Publication

EP 0965291 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111262 A

Priority

DE 19827231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965291A2] The chair with seat area (10), back (14), and four legs (12) is made all in a piece of a firm plastic material with a narrow transversally pointed area (16) between seat part (10) and back (14), acting as a rotation axis. The bow-shaped armrests (20) are swivel mounted to both sides of the back (14) and to an adjustmetn mechanism located behind a cover (24) underneath the seat area (10). When the armrests (20) are simultaneously raised and pulled to the front a lever (27) moves along a longitudinal slot (26) and engages automatically in one of two possible positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/026 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/0265 (2013.01); A47C 1/026 (2013.01); A47C 7/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] FR 2742322 A1 19970620 - GROSFILLEX SARL [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965291 A2 19991222; EP 0965291 A3 20010214; DE 19827231 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-18 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-10-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-02-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 1/024 A

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI