Global Patent Index - EP 0965365 A3

EP 0965365 A3 2000-05-31 - Frame for exercise machines

Title (en)

Frame for exercise machines

Title (de)

Rahmen für Übungsgeräte

Title (fr)

Chassis pour appareils d'exercice

Publication

EP 0965365 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99830362 A

Priority

IT BO980375 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965365A2] A frame for exercise machines provides for the elements that comprise the frame (1), i.e. a pair of uprights (2, 3) and an upper cross member (4), mutually associated to define a portal, to be realized with a respective tubular bar (5) with substantially oval/elliptical cross section. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 21/062; F16B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/062 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 21/0628 (2015.10); A63B 2225/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965365 A2 19991222; EP 0965365 A3 20000531; IT 1304009 B1 20010302; IT BO980375 A1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040420

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031209

2001-02-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001122

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ALESSANDRI, NERIO

2001-01-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CAMELLI, MARCO

2000-06-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 63B 21/062 A

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI