Global Patent Index - EP 0965395 A3

EP 0965395 A3 2001-02-21 - Coil forming head for wire

Title (en)

Coil forming head for wire

Title (de)

Windungsleger für Draht

Title (fr)

Tête de formation de boucles de fil

Publication

EP 0965395 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111451 A

Priority

DE 19827348 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965395A2] The arrangement has a sleeve-shaped carrier (5) rotatable about an axis (2) with a characteristic maximum speed and an application tube (1) rotating about the carrier with a wire outlet connected to the carrier via a holding arrangement. A compensation plate (6) used to compensate for the imbalance caused by the application tube and holding arrangement is mounted opposite the application tube relative to the rotation axis in each axial position and can rotate about the carrier. The plate thickness and height are selected to locally compensate for the imbalance caused by the application tube and mounting plate in each plane perpendicular to the rotation axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/02 (2006.01); B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B65H 54/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965395 A2 19991222; EP 0965395 A3 20010221; EP 0965395 B1 20020911; AT 223766 T 20020915; DE 19827348 A1 19991223; JP 2000026023 A 20000125; US 6196486 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080613

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080612

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080612

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080612

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090101

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080612

2009-02-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070621

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902621 20021017

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223766 T 20020915

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020212

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES GB IT

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990714

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI