Global Patent Index - EP 0965396 A3

EP 0965396 A3 2001-02-21 - Coil forming head for wire

Title (en)

Coil forming head for wire

Title (de)

Legekopf eines Windungslegers für Draht

Title (fr)

Tête de formation de boucles de fil

Publication

EP 0965396 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111452 A

Priority

DE 19827349 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965396A2] Running head has a base body (1) rotatable about a rotation axis (3) and a tube holder (2) attached to the base body to rotate with it. Tube holder has an application tube (4) that runs from an inlet end coaxial with the rotation axis to an outlet end tangential to the rotation axis, so defining a curved guide path about the rotation axis. Tube holder with application tube together form a unit detachable from the base body by releasing single bolt (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/14 (2006.01); B65H 54/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21C 47/143 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965396 A2 19991222; EP 0965396 A3 20010221; EP 0965396 B1 20030507; AT 239563 T 20030515; DE 19827349 A1 19991223; JP 2000026024 A 20000125; US 6179237 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SMS GROUP GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SMS SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 40237 DUESSELDORF, DE

- Document: DE 59905406

2015-08-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905406

- Representative's name: HEMMERICH & KOLLEGEN, DE

2004-04-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040210

2003-10-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905406 P 20030612

2003-05-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2003-05-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011207

2002-01-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990712

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI