Global Patent Index - EP 0965448 A3

EP 0965448 A3 2000-04-19 - Metering device

Title (en)

Metering device

Title (de)

Dosiereinrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif doseur

Publication

EP 0965448 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111471 A

Priority

DE 19827295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965448A2] A fluid dosing system for a rotary press, e.g. for applying water or ink etc., has the fluid trough (5) fitted with a vibrator. This can be either an internal vibrator (13) in the fluid or an external vibrator (12) outside the fluid. The vibrator can be mechanical, electric, pneumatic, ultrasonic or any other suitable device. The vibrations reduce the effective surface tension of the fluid and ensure an even pick-up rate for the fluid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/03; B41F 7/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/03 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965448 A2 19991222; EP 0965448 A3 20000419; DE 19827295 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-06 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010407

2001-01-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000313

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 31/03 A, 7B 41F 7/32 B

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI