Global Patent Index - EP 0965449 A3

EP 0965449 A3 2000-04-05 - Wedge ink duct

Title (en)

Wedge ink duct

Title (de)

Keilfarbkasten

Title (fr)

Bac d'encrage à coins

Publication

EP 0965449 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111469 A

Priority

DE 19826817 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965449A2] An ink dosing system for an offset printing press has a removable ink tray (4) positioned onto a sloping support (2) under the dosing roller (1). The tray is secured by a threaded fastener (6) and has an ink reservoir (10) formed between a control profile (9) and the dosing roller. A lip (3) at the bottom of the support controls the dosing gap while the reservoir is connected by a duct (11) to an external ink reservoir. A flat seal (5) under the tray prevents ink moving under the tray.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/04; B41F 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2006.01); B41F 31/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/04 (2013.01); B41F 31/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965449 A2 19991222; EP 0965449 A3 20000405; EP 0965449 B1 20020814; DE 19826817 A1 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100612

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100612

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100612

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090615

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-08-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021129

2002-09-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59902319

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-09-19

2002-08-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000306

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI