Global patent index - EP 0965542 A3

EP 0965542 A3 2000-01-05 - Refuse bin washing apparatus

Title (en)

Refuse bin washing apparatus

Title (de)

Waschanlage für Müllbehälter

Title (fr)

Installation de lavage pour conteneur à ordures

Publication

EP 0965542 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304621 A

Priority

  • GB 9812569 A
  • GB 9822587 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965542A2] A refuse bin washing apparatus comprises a elevated, inclined support (14) for a refuse bin (W) to be washed, and a lifting assembly for lifting a refuse bin from the ground and onto the support. The lifting assembly comprises a structure (20) for pivoting about a horizontal axis, and having means (24-26) for engaging and supporting the refuse bin. The lifting assembly is arranged so that, upon turning the structure about its axis of pivoting, the bin is lifted and turned until its rear wall lies on the support and its top faces outwardly. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 7/005 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965542 A2 19991222; EP 0965542 A3 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2001-04-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-10-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI