Global patent index - EP 0965554 A3

EP 0965554 A3 2000-08-16 - Yarn traverse device and take-up winder having the same

Title (en)

Yarn traverse device and take-up winder having the same

Title (de)

Fadenchangiervorrichtung und Aufwickelmaschine mit dieser Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de va-et-vient de fil et bobinoir muni d'un tel mécanisme

Publication

EP 0965554 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99108148 A

Priority

  • JP 16952698 A
  • JP 16952798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965554A2] The present invention relates to a yarn traverse device wherein the rotation planes of an upper rotating wing 1 and a lower rotating wing 7 of each yarn traverse unit U are all arranged in parallel with the rotation axis t1 of a touch roller T, and wherein the rotation planes of the upper rotating wing 1 and the lower rotating wing 7 of all yarn traverse units are arranged in four planes. Each yarn traverse unit U can be independently operated without consideration for the driving timings between adjacent yarn traverse units U. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/00 (2006.01); B65H 54/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/2839 (2013.01); B65H 54/2881 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965554 A2 19991222; EP 0965554 A3 20000816; CN 1239065 A 19991222; KR 20000006209 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status

2003-03-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030114

2002-12-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021104

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001221

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI