Global Patent Index - EP 0965563 B8

EP 0965563 B8 2003-06-25 - Manufacture of edible frozen products

Title (en)

Manufacture of edible frozen products

Title (de)

Herstellung von essbaren gefrorenen Produkten

Title (fr)

Fabrication de produits congelés comestibles

Publication

EP 0965563 B8 (EN)

Application

EP 99304318 A

Priority

  • GB 9812915 A
  • GB 9906310 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965563A1] A simple, inexpensive method of producing a gas hydrate is provided comprising the steps: (i) filling a vessel with an amount of liquid water and/or frozen water, (ii) adding an amount of condensed hydrate forming gas to the vessel in a manner such that the condensed gas does not come into contact with liquid water, (iii) contacting the condensed gas, and/or its' sublimation or liquification products at a suitable pressure with the liquid and/or frozen water mixture to produce a reaction mixture, and keeping the reaction mixture at, or below, the maximum temperature at which the gas hydrate is stable and at a suitable pressure for a sufficient time to produce the gas hydrate. Also provided is the gas hydrate produced by the method, which has a high gas content. A reaction vessel comprising means for separating the condensed hydrate forming gas from the liquid/frozen water is also provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C01B 31/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23P 30/40 (2016.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); C01B 32/50 (2017.01); C01B 32/55 (2017.01); C01B 33/20 (2006.01); C01B 33/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C01B 33/22 (2013.01); C01B 33/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965563 A1 19991222; EP 0965563 B1 20030423; EP 0965563 B8 20030625; AR 018663 A1 20011128; AT 238234 T 20030515; AU 3504799 A 19991223; BR 9902263 A 20000125; BR 9902263 B1 20090505; CA 2273503 A1 19991215; CA 2273503 C 20081202; CN 100457611 C 20090204; CN 1263865 A 20000823; DE 69907074 D1 20030528; DE 69907074 T2 20040304; ES 2196724 T3 20031216; GB 9906310 D0 19990512; HU 9901813 A2 20010428; HU 9901813 A3 20010730; HU 9901813 D0 19990728; ID 23555 A 20000504; IL 130248 A 20020210; IL 130248 D0 20000601; JP 2000044221 A 20000215; PL 333697 A1 19991220; PT 965563 E 20030829; SK 72999 A3 20000118; TR 199901311 A1 20000121; US 6149951 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170620

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-29 [REG DE R079] AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS

- Document: DE 69907074

- Free text: PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C01B0031200000

- IPC: C01B0032500000

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160614

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-01-12 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110101

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-02-26 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090715

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090624

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070603

2008-01-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2007-12-18 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20071203

2007-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060605

2006-06-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060604

2006-05-22 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060519

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050622

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-21 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050621

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196724 T3

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

2003-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-07-23 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-06-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

2003-06-04 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

2003-05-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907074 P 20030528

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER PLC

2001-02-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNILEVER N.V.

2000-08-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991115

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI