Global Patent Index - EP 0965668 A3

EP 0965668 A3 2000-01-05 - Method and device for transferring a wound sheet of yarns to a beam

Title (en)

Method and device for transferring a wound sheet of yarns to a beam

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Uebergeben eines Fadenfeldes von einem Fadenwickel auf einen Wickelbaum

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour transférer une nappe enroulée de fils sur une ensouple

Publication

EP 0965668 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98810555 A

Priority

EP 98810555 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965668A2] To transfer a band of warps (1) from a beaming roll (2) to a warp beam (3), which are on parallel axes (6,7), a suspension rod (9) suspends the warps. The suspension rod (9) is moved by a transfer system (8) on a set path parallel to the axes (6,7) while unwinding the warps at the same time from the beaming roll (2) while moving to the warp beam (3). To transfer a band of warps (1) from a beaming roll (2) to a warp beam (3), which are on parallel axes (6,7), a suspension rod (9) suspends the warps. The suspension rod (9) is moved by a transfer system (8) on a set path parallel to the axes (6,7) while unwinding the warps at the same time from the beaming roll (2) while moving to the warp beam (3). The band of warps (1) is unwound over the apex line (34) of the beaming roll (2) to maintain warp tension. The beaming roll (2) is subjected to a braking force, at least during the transfer of the band of warps (1). An Independent claim is included for an assembly to transfer the warps, with a transfer unit (8) composed of two continuous transport chains (10), with a reversible movement. The suspension rod (9) is at the lower (27) and upper (26) chain levels, to be moved to the warp beam (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02H 7/00; D02H 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D02H 5/02 (2006.01); D02H 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02H 7/00 (2013.01); D02H 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965668 A2 19991222; EP 0965668 A3 20000105; EP 0965668 B1 20030423; DE 59808068 D1 20030528; ES 2198040 T3 20040116; US 6192560 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BENNINGER A.G.

- Effective date: 20050630

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050618

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-06-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050617

2004-06-16 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040607

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040520

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-23 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2004-03-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030723

2004-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040101

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2198040 T3

2004-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-07-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-17 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808068 P 20030528

2003-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2003-04-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: RO SI

2003-04-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-23 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030423

2002-11-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING A WOUND SHEET OF YARNS TO A BEAM

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020807

2000-12-13 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000323;SI PAYMENT 20000323

2000-11-02 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000323

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2000-10-25 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2000-10-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2000-10-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-10-18 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000819;SI PAYMENT 20000819

2000-10-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL PT

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI