Global patent index - EP 0965671 A3

EP 0965671 A3 2000-12-13 - Dust removing device for a yarn furnisher on a knitting machine

Title (en)

Dust removing device for a yarn furnisher on a knitting machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entstauben eines Fadenlieferwerks einer Strickmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de dépoussiérage d'un fournisseur en fil d'un métier à tricoter

Publication

EP 0965671 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111484 A

Priority

DE 19827289 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965671A2] System to clean dust away from the yarn feed in a knitter, uses an air stream (11) with its working range is generally over the zone (17) where the yarns (6) travel from the yarn feed (5) to the needle section (4) of the knitter (2). Preferred Features: The air stream (11) emerges from the blower (9) to move over the yarn path zone (17). On leaving the blower (9), the air stream (11) first strikes the yarn feed (5), and the air deflected from it passes generally outside the yarn path zone (17). The air stream (11) moves vertically downwards, in the outer zone (8) of the knitter (2). The inner zone (7) with the needle section (4) is defined by the flanking outer zones (8). The air is extracted from the knitter (2) by a suction system (13) at the base (12) of the assembly. The air propelled by the blower (9) into the knitter has been cleaned, moistened and/or heated. An air stream (15) is blown into the inner zone (7) of the knitter (2) through an air feed (14) towards the needle section (4), moving vertically downwards. The air stream (15) into the inner zone (7) of the knitter (2) is at a speed which generates an over pressure in the inner zone (7), to give a slow drift of the air stream (15) as far as the outer zones (8) where it meets the outer air streams (11) to be deflected together with them towards the base (12). The inner air stream (15) slowly penetrates through the yarn path zone (17) in a laminar air flow structure. The air stream (15) passes to the base area (12) or is extracted (13) by suction. The inner air stream (15) has been cleaned, moistened and/or heated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 35/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 35/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965671 A2 19991222; EP 0965671 A3 20001213; DE 19827289 A1 19991223; DE 19827289 C2 20031204

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI