Global Patent Index - EP 0965685 A3

EP 0965685 A3 2001-03-14 - Tamping beam for a road finisher

Title (en)

Tamping beam for a road finisher

Title (de)

Einbaubohle für einen Strassenfertiger

Title (fr)

Poutre dameuse pour finisseuse

Publication

EP 0965685 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110690 A

Priority

DE 19827577 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19827577C1] The surface leveler has a base plate (1) coupled to a vibration drive preceded by an electrically heated stamping rail which is moved backwards and forwards. At least one coil (10) is positioned adjacent the stamping rail and coupled to a HF current source (11), for inducing eddy currents in the stamping rail, which acts as a short circuit for the magnetic field provided by the coil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01C 19/40; H05B 6/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01C 19/48 (2006.01); E01C 19/40 (2006.01); H05B 6/02 (2006.01); H05B 6/10 (2006.01); H05B 6/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 6/105 (2013.01); E01C 19/407 (2013.01); E01C 2301/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19827577 C1 19991028; BR 9903268 A 20000418; CA 2275522 A1 19991220; CA 2275522 C 20051025; CN 1148489 C 20040505; CN 1240244 A 20000105; EP 0965685 A2 19991222; EP 0965685 A3 20010314; EP 0965685 B1 20040310; JP 2000027117 A 20000125; JP 4083349 B2 20080430; US 6124580 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160602

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908794

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150826

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2005-02-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-09-08 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908794 P 20040415

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI