Global Patent Index - EP 0965718 B1

EP 0965718 B1 2001-05-23 - Fixing arrangement for fastening a fixed window or door frame

Title (en)

Fixing arrangement for fastening a fixed window or door frame

Title (de)

Befestigungsanordnung zur Befestigung eines Blendrahmens

Title (fr)

Ensemble de fixation d'un dormant

Publication

EP 0965718 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111552 A

Priority

DE 29811003 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965718A1] The mounting (11) is for a screen frame at the jamb fitted to the building wall. A lock (12) has a sliding movement to give a grip in relation to each other on the longitudinal direction (14) of the screen frame section and/or the jamb section at the screen frame. The mounting (11) has projecting teeth (13) from the jamb frame side (5), and the lock has locking teeth (15) projecting from the screen frame side (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/6046 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811003 U1 19980903; AT 201478 T 20010615; EP 0965718 A1 19991222; EP 0965718 B1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080624

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060615

2006-06-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060615

2005-06-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050629

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050608

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010809

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900098 20010628

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201478 T 20010615

2000-11-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FIXING ARRANGEMENT FOR FASTENING A FIXED WINDOW OR DOOR FRAME

2000-08-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991202

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI