Global Patent Index - EP 0965739 A3

EP 0965739 A3 2000-07-26 - Diesel engine

Title (en)

Diesel engine

Title (de)

Dieselmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur diesel

Publication

EP 0965739 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810437 A

Priority

  • EP 99810437 A
  • EP 98810548 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965739A2] The diesel engine has a cylinder bush (21) in which a piston (20) moves. A slide part (24) bounding on the lower end of the bush forms a slide valve with the bush and has a drive independent of the piston that moves the slide part away from and towards the bush. During the movement away from the bush an annular opening (210) is formed for the flow of flushing air to the cylinder chamber (22) that closes when the slide part is moved back to the bush.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 25/04; F01L 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 5/06 (2006.01); F02B 25/04 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 25/04 (2013.01); F01L 5/06 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F02F 2007/0097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965739 A2 19991222; EP 0965739 A3 20000726

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020813

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020402

2001-04-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI