Global Patent Index - EP 0965749 A3

EP 0965749 A3 2001-05-02 - A valve control unit for a fuel injector

Title (en)

A valve control unit for a fuel injector

Title (de)

Ventilsteuereinheit für ein Kraftstoffeinspritzventil

Title (fr)

Une commande de soupape pour un injecteur de combustible

Publication

EP 0965749 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106007 A

Priority

DE 19826794 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965749A2] The valve control unit has a housing body (2) contg. two interconnected valve control chambers (8,9). The end element (7) of a valve control piston (3) movable in the housing body can be displaced into the first chamber (8), which is connected to a fuel delivery channel (10). The second valve control chamber (9) is connected to a closable outlet channel (11). A mechanical stop mounted on the housing body limits the movement of the valve control piston in the direction of the second valve control chamber. An Independent claim is also included for a valve control chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 45/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 61/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 45/08 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965749 A2 19991222; EP 0965749 A3 20010502; DE 19826794 A1 19991223; JP 2000008989 A 20000111; US 6189815 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040310

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021204

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI