Global Patent Index - EP 0965764 A3

EP 0965764 A3 2000-11-02 - Spring lock device

Title (en)

Spring lock device

Title (de)

Feder- Verriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage à ressort

Publication

EP 0965764 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99111560 A

Priority

IT MI981387 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965764A2] A spring lock device (10) to prevent axial and/or rotational motion of a shaft or rod member (12); the device comprises a locking element in the form of a coil spring (16) arranged in a casing (10), is loosely disposed around the shaft or the rod (12), to provide a locking action in a required position. A thrust member (18) operatively connected to a pressure actuated control device (19) acts on the arms (16A, 16B) of the coil spring (16) to grip the rod (12) preventing any sliding and/or rotational movement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/262 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965764 A2 19991222; EP 0965764 A3 20001102; EP 0965764 B1 20041208; DE 69922444 D1 20050113; DE 69922444 T2 20051208; IT 1301738 B1 20000707; IT MI981387 A1 19991217

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160622

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-02-02 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIGLIORI, LUCIANO

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922444 P 20050113

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVER S.P.A.

2004-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNIVER S.P.A.

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIGLIORI, LUCIANO

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIGLIORI, LUCIANO

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI