Global Patent Index - EP 0965764 B1

EP 0965764 B1 2004-12-08 - Spring lock device

Title (en)

Spring lock device

Title (de)

Feder- Verriegelungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de verrouillage à ressort

Publication

EP 0965764 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 99111560 A

Priority

IT MI981387 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965764A2] A spring lock device (10) to prevent axial and/or rotational motion of a shaft or rod member (12); the device comprises a locking element in the form of a coil spring (16) arranged in a casing (10), is loosely disposed around the shaft or the rod (12), to provide a locking action in a required position. A thrust member (18) operatively connected to a pressure actuated control device (19) acts on the arms (16A, 16B) of the coil spring (16) to grip the rod (12) preventing any sliding and/or rotational movement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 15/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965764 A2 19991222; EP 0965764 A3 20001102; EP 0965764 B1 20041208; DE 69922444 D1 20050113; DE 69922444 T2 20051208; IT 1301738 B1 20000707; IT MI981387 A1 19991217

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-11-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050909

2005-09-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-03-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-03-08 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050308

2005-02-02 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIGLIORI, LUCIANO

2005-01-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922444 P 20050113

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-12-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-12-08 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-12-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041208

2004-09-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVER S.P.A.

2004-09-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: UNIVER S.P.A.

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030813

2003-01-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MIGLIORI, LUCIANO

2003-01-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MIGLIORI, LUCIANO

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010323

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI