Global Patent Index - EP 0965793 A3

EP 0965793 A3 2000-02-23 - Exhaust gas fitting for gas-fired wall-mounted devices, particularly water heaters

Title (en)

Exhaust gas fitting for gas-fired wall-mounted devices, particularly water heaters

Title (de)

Abgasanschluss für gasbeheizte Wandgeräte, insbesondere Wassererhitzer

Title (fr)

Armature de raccordement des fumées pour appareils murals, notamment chauffe-eau

Publication

EP 0965793 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99108485 A

Priority

DE 29810921 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965793A2] The exhaust point for the wall apparatus (10) comprises a pipe section whose exit side has a guiding pipe (20) going through a hole in the wall (12). Its entry side has an exhaust opening, and, if necessary, may be connected with a fresh air inlet opening via an intermediate pipe (18) which consists of two detachable half-shells (22-24) clamped together. The clamping surfaces of the half-shells may be sealed with a pasty substance or gum. The flue of the exhaust guide may have an intermediate exhaust pipe. It may be linked to an installed exhaust pipe in the wall apparatus, and may also be linked to a further exhaust pipe (42) that extends in the pipe section (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23J 13/04; F23L 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23J 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23L 17/04 (2013.01); F23J 13/025 (2013.01); F23J 2211/101 (2013.01); F23J 2213/203 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29810921 U1 19991104; EP 0965793 A2 19991222; EP 0965793 A3 20000223

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20030525

2003-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021108

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE GB IT NL

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000823

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE GB IT NL

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI