Global Patent Index - EP 0965805 A3

EP 0965805 A3 2000-05-03 - Vertical type vibration dryer

Title (en)

Vertical type vibration dryer

Title (de)

Vibrationstrockner von vertikalem Typ

Title (fr)

Sécheur à vibrations du type vertical

Publication

EP 0965805 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105002 A

Priority

JP 17029498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965805A2] A vertical type vibration dryer comprises a barrel shaped drying vessel (4) vertically mounted, a vibration means (V) for vibrating the drying vessel and a heating means (5) for heating the drying vessel. The vibration means (V) is arranged below the drying vessel (4) and connected with the vessel by means of a mounting means (14). The mounting means comprises a tapered tubing member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 11/02; F26B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 7/00 (2006.01); F26B 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 7/00 (2013.01); F26B 11/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965805 A2 19991222; EP 0965805 A3 20000503

INPADOC legal status


2004-04-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020301

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR NL

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI