Global Patent Index - EP 0965806 A3

EP 0965806 A3 2001-05-09 - Method and apparatus for drying a textile fabric

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for drying a textile fabric

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Trocknung einer textilen Warenbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de séchage d'une étoffe textile

Publication

EP 0965806 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304683 A

Priority

GB 9812947 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965806A2] Fabric (1) is dried by means of gas fired emitters (6) that can be selectively switched on and off to control the amount the drying. A control system measures the steam evaporating from the fabric surface, the speed of conveyance of the fabric (1) and the surface temperature of the fabric and switches on or off gas fired emitters (6) accordingly to ensure the fabric emerges from the drier at a desired residual moisture content without burning or scorching. A heat setter comprising modulated electric short wave emitters (10) and a pyrometer (11) may be used to heat set the fabric after drying. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/12; F26B 3/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 3/30 (2006.01); F26B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 13/12 (2013.01); F26B 3/30 (2013.01); F26B 3/305 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965806 A2 19991222; EP 0965806 A3 20010509; GB 9812947 D0 19980812

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011110

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI