Global patent index - EP 0965892 A3

EP 0965892 A3 2000-12-06 - Toner cartridge

Title (en)

Toner cartridge

Title (de)

Tonerkartusche

Title (fr)

Cartouche de toner

Publication

EP 0965892 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111449 A

Priority

DE 19827547 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965892A2] The toner cartridge (10) has a hollow cylindrical main body (11) which is rotated about its longitudinal axis, with a toner discharge opening (13) of reduced diameter at one of its ends, provided by the smaller diameter end of a tapering hollow cylinder (17) within the main body. The toner is transported by spiral ribs (22,24) in the outside surface of the tapering hollow cylinder and in the inside surface of the main body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03G 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03G 15/0872 (2013.01); G03G 15/087 (2013.01); G03G 2215/0668 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965892 A2 19991222; EP 0965892 A3 20001206; DE 19827547 C1 20000113; JP 2000039760 A 20000208; JP 3049611 B2 20000605; US 6038422 A 20000314

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030209

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020619

2001-10-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-08-29 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): BE CH FR GB IE IT LI NL

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

2001-07-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010526

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES LI

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI