Global patent index - EP 0965927 A3

EP 0965927 A3 2000-03-22 - Client intermediation of server applications

Title (en)

Client intermediation of server applications

Title (de)

Klient-Zwischenhandlung von Serveranwendungen

Title (fr)

Intermédiation client des applications serveur

Publication

EP 0965927 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201873 A

Priority

US 9948998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965927A2] One embodiment of the present invention provides a method and an apparatus for providing a client-side intermediary that communicates with an application (112) on a second server computer system (104). The method operates by receiving a composite message at a client computer system (108) from a first server computer system (102), and examining (304) type information from the composite-message. This type information specifies how the composite message is formatted, and can be used to select an application that is capable of processing the composite message. The method uses the type information to look up (306) a network address of the application residing on the second server computer system. This address is used (308) to forward (310) the composite message to the application on the second server computer system. The above embodiment can be implemented within a browser (114) on the client computer system, or within a separate application (120) on the client computer system. A return communication can be facilitated by receiving a return composite message at the client computer system from the second server computer system, and examining type information from the return composite message. This type information is used to look up an address of a source application on the network (106), and this address is used to forward the return composite message to the source application. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/46 (2006.01); G06Q 20/10 (2012.01); H04L 29/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/546 (2013.01); G06Q 20/102 (2013.01); H04L 67/02 (2013.01); H04L 67/16 (2013.01); H04L 67/2814 (2013.01); H04L 67/327 (2013.01); H04L 69/329 (2013.01); H04L 67/289 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 9806207 A1 19980212 - VERIFONE INC [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9711429 A1 19970327 - INFONAUTICS CORP [US]
  • [A] LUOTONEN A ET AL: "World-Wide Web proxies", COMPUTER NETWORKS AND ISDN SYSTEMS,NL,NORTH HOLLAND PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, vol. 27, no. 2, 1 November 1994 (1994-11-01), pages 147 - 154, XP004037985, ISSN: 0169-7552
  • [A] "METHODOLOGY TO EXECUTE AND FORWARD APPLICATION COMMANDS AT REMOTE WORKSTATIONS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN,US,IBM CORP. NEW YORK, vol. 34, no. 10A, 1 March 1992 (1992-03-01), pages 44 - 46, XP000302216, ISSN: 0018-8689

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965927 A2 19991222; EP 0965927 A3 20000322; EP 0965927 B1 20011219; CN 1154056 C 20040616; CN 1239790 A 19991229; DE 69900620 D1 20020131; DE 69900620 T2 20020718; JP 2000035926 A 20000202; JP 4404404 B2 20100127; US 6138148 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160607

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070614

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070614

2006-06-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2004-06-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040608

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-06-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040603

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Opponent name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS ELECTRONICS N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69900620

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-01-31

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-03-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 17/30 A, 7G 06F 9/46 B

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI