Global Patent Index - EP 0965934 A3

EP 0965934 A3 2000-02-09 - Data management and communication system for a domestic environment

Title (en)

Data management and communication system for a domestic environment

Title (de)

Datenverwaltungs- und Kommunikationssystem für eine häusliche Umgebung

Title (fr)

Système de gestion et de communication de données pour un environement domestique

Publication

EP 0965934 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304596 A

Priority

  • GB 9813191 A
  • GB 9819316 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965795A2] An apparatus including a kitchen appliance, such as a microwave oven (10), incorporates a data terminal (12,16) which receives power from the same power supply (28) as provides power for the kitchen appliance. The data terminal (12,16) is effective to send messages to, and receive messages from, a communications network of the Internet type.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 7/02 (2006.01); F24C 7/04 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 30/00 (2012.01); G06Q 99/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/00 (2006.01); G10L 15/26 (2006.01); H05B 6/68 (2006.01); F25D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/107 (2013.01); G06Q 30/06 (2013.01); G06Q 99/00 (2013.01); G10L 15/26 (2013.01); H05B 6/6435 (2013.01); H05B 6/6441 (2013.01); H05B 6/668 (2013.01); F25B 2600/07 (2013.01); F25D 29/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0837599 A2 19980422 - NEXTLEVEL SYSTEMS INC [US]
  • [A] US 4533948 A 19850806 - MCNAMARA ROBERT P [US], et al
  • [A] WO 9824040 A1 19980604 - NCR INT INC [US], et al
  • [X] LEWIS T: "INFORMATION APPLIANCES: GADGET NETOPIA", COMPUTER,US,IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US, vol. 31, no. 1, pages 59-68, XP000737920, ISSN: 0018-9162
  • [X] GOLDBERG L: "INFORMATION APPLIANCES: FROM WEB PHONES TO SMART REFRIGERATORS", ELECTRONIC DESIGN,US,PENTON PUBLISHING, CLEVELAND, OH, vol. 46, no. 7, pages 69-70,74,76,78, XP000780456, ISSN: 0013-4872
  • [A] LAWTON G: "DAWN OF THE INTERNET APPLIANCE", COMPUTER,US,IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, LONG BEACH., CA, US, vol. 30, no. 10, pages 16,18, XP000738076, ISSN: 0018-9162
  • [A] DAVID KLINE: "The embedded Internet", WIRED, vol. 4, no. 10, 31 October 1996 (1996-10-31), XP002125117, Retrieved from the Internet <URL:http://wired.lycos.com/wired/archive/4.10/es_embedded_pr.html> [retrieved on 19991208]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965796 A2 19991222; EP 0965796 A3 20000705; EP 0965795 A2 19991222; EP 0965795 A3 20000705; EP 0965934 A2 19991222; EP 0965934 A3 20000209; EP 0971174 A2 20000112; EP 0971174 A3 20000705; EP 0971175 A2 20000112; EP 0971175 A3 20000719; EP 0971176 A2 20000112; EP 0971176 A3 20000705; JP 2000039155 A 20000208; JP 2000097436 A 20000404; JP 2000097437 A 20000404; JP 2000097438 A 20000404; JP 2000104927 A 20000411; JP 2000111057 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050702

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI