Global Patent Index - EP 0965963 A3

EP 0965963 A3 2000-12-20 - Game system for playing with medals

Title (en)

Game system for playing with medals

Title (de)

Münzschiebespielgerät

Title (fr)

Machine de jeu à poussoir

Publication

EP 0965963 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99304127 A

Priority

JP 18141998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965963A2] To properly manage the flow of a medal, which affects a paying-out rate, a medal game system is provided. The system supplies the medal through a field has an apparatus for controlling supply of the medal. The apparatus comprises a detecting device for detecting the flow of the medal passing the field and a adjusting device for physically adjusting the flow of the medal based on information given by the detecting device. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63F 9/00 (2006.01); G07D 9/00 (2006.01); G07F 17/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3297 (2013.01); G07D 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965963 A2 19991222; EP 0965963 A3 20001220; EP 0965963 B1 20080409; EP 0965963 B8 20080716; CN 1141997 C 20040317; CN 1239002 A 19991222; DE 69938476 D1 20080521; HK 1023430 A1 20080808; JP 2000000373 A 20000107; TW 457109 B 20011001

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150527

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150527

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20090130

2009-03-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090112

2009-01-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080710

2008-08-08 [REG HK GR] STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: GR

- Ref Document Number: 1023430

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2008-06-18 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KONAMI DIGITAL ENTERTAINMENT CO., LTD.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-05-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69938476

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-05-21

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2008-04-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-08-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050617

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KONAMI CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010305

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI