Global Patent Index - EP 0965971 A3

EP 0965971 A3 2000-04-12 - Device for monting an information card

Title (en)

Device for monting an information card

Title (de)

Anordnung zum Anbringen einer Kennzeichnungskarte

Title (fr)

Dispositif de montage d'une carte d'informations

Publication

EP 0965971 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111584 A

Priority

  • DE 29810837 U
  • DE 19859279 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0965971A2] The card carrier (1,2) comprises a base plate (2) and a tab (1), whereby in the area between the base plate and the tab at least one rib (4) extends vertically to the base plate and the tab, and forms the first abutment edge. The tab has apertures (7), by means of which the card carrier is connectable to the counter component. Preferred Features: The base plate has a cavity, in which the designation card can be inserted. A cover (8) is provided, which covers the base plate. The tab has a recess (5), the side of which facing the base plate is slightly inclined, so that securing components (11) on the cover engaging in the recess can be secured to the tab.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0965971 A2 19991222; EP 0965971 A3 20000412

INPADOC legal status


2001-06-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 09F 3/20 A, 7G 09F 3/18 B, 7A 47G 1/06 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI