Global Patent Index - EP 0966061 A3

EP 0966061 A3 2000-02-02 - Method for the electrical and mechanical connection of electrically conductive parts and device for carrying out this method

Title (en)

Method for the electrical and mechanical connection of electrically conductive parts and device for carrying out this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur elektrischen und mechanischen Verbindung von elektrisch leitenden Bauteilen und Vorrichtung zur Durchführung dieses Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la connexion électrique et mécanique des composants électroconductrices et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de cette méthode

Publication

EP 0966061 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890034 A

Priority

AT 103598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0966061A2] The connection uses an electroconductive adhesive (30) for providing a mechanical and electrical connection between a pair of conductive components (1,2), at least one of which is made of aluminum metal or alloy. An Independent claim for a device for providing an electrically conductive adhesive between 2 conductive components is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/04; H01R 11/28; H01R 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/04 (2006.01); H01R 4/58 (2006.01); H01R 4/20 (2006.01); H01R 4/62 (2006.01); H01R 11/11 (2006.01); H01R 11/28 (2006.01); H01R 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/04 (2013.01); H01R 4/58 (2013.01); H01R 4/20 (2013.01); H01R 4/62 (2013.01); H01R 11/11 (2013.01); H01R 11/281 (2013.01); H01R 43/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0966061 A2 19991222; EP 0966061 A3 20000202; EP 0966061 B1 20040114; DE 59908282 D1 20040219; ES 2212514 T3 20040716

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908282

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141031

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130221

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110203

2012-04-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120411

2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110202

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100209

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-01-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20091214

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080202

2008-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080202

2007-02-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050202

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212514 T3

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908282 P 20040219

2004-02-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040114

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-10-29 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FROESCHL, KARL FRANZ

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030507

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI