Global Patent Index - EP 0966064 B1

EP 0966064 B1 2000-03-01 - Multipole electrical connector

Title (en)

Multipole electrical connector

Title (de)

Mehrpoliger Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique multipolaire

Publication

EP 0966064 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98113150 A

Priority

DE 19821858 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19845875A1] The stranded wires are guided into parallel channels (8) of a cable receptacle and clamped into the channels. A pressing plate (6) is provided in the cable receptacle. The pressing plate is elastic in the radial direction across contact pins (19) in the channels. Releasable clamping members (20,21) press the pressing plate around the periphery of the pressing plate. The clamping members hold the ends of the stranded wires laid in the channels with approximately even force on all channels. The channels in the pressing plate and the contact pins may be displaced before the pressing plate is clamped and are aligned after the pressing plate is clamped.

Abstract (de)

Mehrpoliger Steckverbinder zum Anschluß eines mehrpoligen Litzenleiterkabels mit einer Kabelaufnahme und einem Steckteil, wobei die Litzenleiter zur axialen Kontaktierung der freien Enden mit zugeordneten Kontaktspießen des Steckteils in achsparallen Kanälen der Kabelaufnahme geführt und mittels einer Überwurfmutter in den Kanälen klemmend gehalten sind. Die Kabelaufnahme weist eine Litzenleiterhalterung zum unverrückbaren Fixieren der Litzenleiter und daran anschließend eine dem Steckteil zugewandte Endhalterung auf. Die Litzenleiterhalterung besteht aus einer festen, der Endhalterung zugewandten Fixierplatte und einer in axialer Richtung bewegbaren Klemmplatte, die jeden Litzenleiter bei der Bewegung in Richtung Fixierplatte gleichmäßig gegen Zugbewegungen unverrückbar klemmt. Die Endhalterung ist zumindest über die Eindringlänge der Kontaktspieße in die Kanäle in radialer Richtung elastisch ausgebildet, um bei eingeführten Kontaktspießen durch Zusammenquetschen am Umfang einen für die Kontaktierung im wesentlichen gleichmäßigen radialen Preßdruck in allen Kanälen bei angepaßtem Kanaldurchmesser zu erzeugen. Diese Ausbildung erlaubt einen sehr kurzen mehrpoligen Steckverbinder, bei dem die Anzahl der Litzenleiterkanäle und deren Bestückung keinen Einfluß auf die Klemmung hat. Gleichzeitig erfolgt die Klemmung nahe an dem Kontaktbereich, um ein Stauchen der Litzenleiter in den Kanälen zu vermeiden. Darüber hinaus wird durch diese Ausbildung ein Fliesen der Litzenleiterisolation beim Einstecken der Kontatkspieße durch flexible Kanalwände verhindert, andererseits aber ein permanenter und gleichmäßiger Kontaktdruck auf die verdichteten Litzenleiter sichergestellt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/50; H01R 13/59

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/50 (2006.01); H01R 13/58 (2006.01); H01R 13/59 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/59 (2013.01); H01R 4/5033 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29817679 U1 19981224; DE 19845875 A1 19991118; DE 19845875 C2 20030123; DE 29908462 U1 19990923; EP 0966064 A1 19991222; EP 0966064 B1 20000301; JP 2000012152 A 20000114; JP 3141346 B2 20010305; US 6083036 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59800094

- Representative's name: ABACUS PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060731

2007-05-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060715

2006-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060715

2005-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050713

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050708

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-05-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-05-03 [RAP4] CORRECTION OF NAME OR ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER (B DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: CONINVERS, ELEKTROTECHNISCHE BAUELEMENTE GMBH

2000-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800094 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980912

1999-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI