Global Patent Index - EP 0966249 A4

EP 0966249 A4 2001-12-19 - HAIR COLORING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

HAIR COLORING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

HAARFÄRBEMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS POUR COLORANTS CAPILLAIRES

Publication

EP 0966249 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97952374 A

Priority

  • GB 9626713 A
  • US 9722719 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9827945A1] A hair coloring composition comprising: (a) from about 0.0003 moles (per 100 g of composition) to less than about 0.09 moles (per 100 g of composition) of an inorganic peroxygen oxidising agent; and (b) an oxidative hair coloring agent; wherein the pH of each of (a) and (b) is in the range of from about 1 to about 6 and wherein the combined mixture of (a) and (b) has a pH in the range of from about 1 to about 6. The products can provide excellent hair coloring and in-use efficacy benefits including excellent initial color and good wash fastness in combination with reduced hair damage at low pH.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/13

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/00 (2006.01); A61K 8/22 (2006.01); A61K 8/33 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/362 (2006.01); A61K 8/365 (2006.01); A61K 8/368 (2006.01); A61K 8/38 (2006.01); A61K 8/41 (2006.01); A61K 8/44 (2006.01); A61K 8/49 (2006.01); A61Q 5/10 (2006.01); D06P 3/08 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

A61K (2006.01); C09B (2006.01); D06P (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/22 (2013.01); A61K 8/411 (2013.01); A61K 8/415 (2013.01); A61K 8/4926 (2013.01); A61Q 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9827945A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9827945 A1 19980702; AR 013894 A1 20010131; AU 5599798 A 19980717; AU 734671 B2 20010621; BR 9714235 A 20000418; CA 2274813 A1 19980702; CN 1246048 A 20000301; CO 5040086 A1 20010529; CZ 9902215 A3 19991117; EP 0966249 A1 19991229; EP 0966249 A4 20011219; GB 9626713 D0 19970212; HU 0203192 A2 20030428; HU 0203192 D0 20021028; ID 22658 A 19991202; IL 130487 D0 20000601; JP 2000514829 A 20001107; KR 20000069696 A 20001125; NO 993057 A 19990823; NO 993057 D0 19990621; PE 33199 A1 19990423; PL 334248 A1 20000214; SK 84299 A3 20000516; ZA 9711521 B 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1026609

2003-02-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020817

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020206

2001-12-19 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DIAS, LOUIS, CARLOS

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DUNBAR, JAMES, CHARLES

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PRATT, DOMINIC

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990705

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE