Global Patent Index - EP 0966558 B1

EP 0966558 B1 2002-11-27 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ACTIVATED CARBON FIBRE TEXTURE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING AN ACTIVATED CARBON FIBRE TEXTURE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES AKTIVIERTEN GEWEBES AUS KOHLENSTOFFASERN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UNE TEXTURE ACTIVEE EN FIBRES DE CARBONE

Publication

EP 0966558 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 98914905 A

Priority

  • FR 9800504 W
  • FR 9703083 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2760759A1] The invention concerns a carbon precursor cellulose fibre texture impregnated with a composition containing at least a mineral constituent with a function promoting cellulose dehydration, and subjected to thermal treatment, consisting in a rise in temperature at a rate ranging between 1 and 15 DEG C/minute followed by a stage at a temperature between 350 and 500 DEG C, and followed by a step of washing the texture. An activated carbon fibre texture is directly obtained with a specific surface area not less than 600 m<2>/g, without subsequent activating treatment at higher temperature.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01F 11/12; D01F 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01F 9/14 (2006.01); D01F 9/16 (2006.01); D01F 9/22 (2006.01); D03D 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01F 9/22 (2013.01); D01F 9/14 (2013.01); D01F 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2760759 A1 19980918; FR 2760759 B1 19990611; DE 69809718 D1 20030109; DE 69809718 T2 20031218; EP 0966558 A1 19991229; EP 0966558 B1 20021127; ES 2185159 T3 20030416; JP 2001516404 A 20010925; JP 3357080 B2 20021216; US 6120841 A 20000919; WO 9841678 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130313

2014-06-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140610

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131001

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2014-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130312

2014-01-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69809718

- Effective date: 20131001

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-11-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130312

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809718

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69809718

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT MBB, DE

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050312

2004-10-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-12-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-10-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-05-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BLUECHER GMBH

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185159 T3

2003-03-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030217

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69809718 20030109

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010312

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990907

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT