Global Patent Index - EP 0966602 B1

EP 0966602 B1 2002-12-18 - INJECTION VALVE

Title (en)

INJECTION VALVE

Title (de)

EINSPRITZVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION

Publication

EP 0966602 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98928146 A

Priority

  • DE 9800971 W
  • DE 19741850 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19741850A1] It has control valve whose pressure determines position of metering valve shaft with valve push rod subjected to spring pressure. An injection valve for a fuel injection system for an IC engine has devices for multistage control of the effective cross- section of at least one injection opening (42). A valve pushrod allows a first axial stroke that is limited by a primary shoulder (37) on an axially moving intermediate piece (30). Its axial movability allows the valve push rod an additional second stroke against the pressure of a spring (31) which is limited by an end shoulder fixed in the housing. The valve is a control valve (4) for a control chamber (12) whose pressure determines the position of the valve shaft of a metering valve(1). The push rod is subjected to a first pressure spring tensioned against the housing of the injection valve in the closing direction of the control valve. The spring is constructed as a second pressure spring. In the closed state of the control valve, the spring force of the first pressure spring is much smaller than that of the second.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02; F02M 45/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 45/04 (2006.01); F02M 45/08 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F02M 63/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0026 (2013.01); F02M 45/04 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0075 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19741850 A1 19990325; EP 0966602 A1 19991229; EP 0966602 B1 20021218; JP 2001505977 A 20010508; US 6296197 B1 20011002; WO 9915779 A1 19990401

INPADOC legal status


2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2007-06-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070625

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-04-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-04-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050407

2004-04-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040422

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030919

2003-08-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806720 20030130

2003-01-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806720 P 20030130

2002-12-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-12-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010831

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991001

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT