Global Patent Index - EP 0966923 A3

EP 0966923 A3 2000-09-06 - Osteosynthetic plate arrangement

Title (en)

Osteosynthetic plate arrangement

Title (de)

Plattenanordnung zur Osteosynthese

Title (fr)

Plaque d'ostéosynthèse

Publication

EP 0966923 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110875 A

Priority

DE 29811479 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0966923A2] The plate consists of two parts (10,12) which are attached to the bone ends, at either side of the fraction, by a number of screws. The two parts are interconnected by a telescopic arrangement (16,18) which allows axial relative movements of the plates The holes for the fixing screws are elongated in a direction at right angles to the axis of the telescopic arrangement so that, if necessary, the screws can be inserted at an angle to the surface of the plate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/58 (2006.01); A61B 17/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/80 (2013.01); A61B 17/8004 (2013.01); A61B 17/8047 (2013.01); A61B 17/8085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811479 U1 19980903; EP 0966923 A2 19991229; EP 0966923 A3 20000906; JP 2000014677 A 20000118; JP 3033903 B2 20000417; US 6183476 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030424

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-01-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GERHARDT, HARALD, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI