Global Patent Index - EP 0967030 A3

EP 0967030 A3 2001-04-04 - Method and device for adjusting the rollers of a straightening device

Title (en)

Method and device for adjusting the rollers of a straightening device

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Einstellen von verstellbaren Rollen eines Richtapparates

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de réglage des rouleaux d'un dispositif de redressage

Publication

EP 0967030 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111971 A

Priority

DE 19828675 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967030A2] Each roller (4) to be adjusted is individually identified, set in an adjusted relative position, and coupled to its adjusting mechanism (5). After coupling, the position of the roller is determined, and it is adjusted to a position relative to a previously calculated end position, and/or a position dependent upon the wire to be straightened, its dimensions and the straightening process. The adjusting mechanism has a roller setter (2) and a releasable coupling (3) between the setter and the adjusting mechanism of a straightening roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/05 (2006.01); B21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0800876 A2 19971015 - PROGRESS AG [IT]
  • [A] US 5520039 A 19960528 - ALBERT ECKEHARD [DE]
  • [A] DE 3309572 A1 19840920 - CHRISTIAN HAEUSLER AG MASCHF [CH]
  • [XP] "AUTOMATIC ACTUATOR TO POSITION STRAIGHTENING ROLLERS", WIRE INDUSTRY,GB,MAGNUM PUBLICATIONS LTD. OXTED, vol. 66, no. 783, March 1999 (1999-03-01), pages 173, XP000802340, ISSN: 0043-6011
  • [XP] "INNOVATIVE RICHTTECHNIK", DRAHT,DE,MEISENBACH KG. BAMBERG, vol. 50, no. 2, April 1999 (1999-04-01), pages 46,49 - 51, XP000829122, ISSN: 0012-5911
  • [AD] D. RUPPIN, Y. RASTERGAR: "Untersuchungen zu den axialen Zugbelastung von Stahldrähten beim Richten im Vielrollenrichtapparat und zur Rollenzustellung", DRAHT, vol. 37, no. 3, 1986, pages 165 - 168, XP002156464

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967030 A2 19991229; EP 0967030 A3 20010404; EP 0967030 B1 20020911; DE 19828675 A1 20000203; DE 19828675 C2 20000525; JP 2000051981 A 20000222; US 6085564 A 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100625

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090626

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-12 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-12-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VEIT, GUSTAV

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ALBERT, ECKEHARD

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010307

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH ES FR GB IT LI SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI