Global Patent Index - EP 0967050 A3

EP 0967050 A3 2001-05-30 - Positioning, holding or clamping device

Title (en)

Positioning, holding or clamping device

Title (de)

Positionier-, Halte- oder Spannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de positionnement, de maintien ou de serrage

Publication

EP 0967050 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 99401235 A

Priority

FR 9808120 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967050A2] The handling mechanism has a casing (1) housing a part (26) that can move in translation. One end (26a) of the mobile part is connected to an actuator (25) and the other end (26b) of the moving part is connected to a lock mechanism (24). The casing has two separated holes (8,9) each receiving a position detector (18,19) for the moving part (26) or its actuator rod (25a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23P 19/00 (2006.01); B23P 19/04 (2006.01); B25B 5/12 (2006.01); B25B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/122 (2013.01); B25B 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967050 A2 19991229; EP 0967050 A3 20010530; FR 2780324 A1 19991231; FR 2780324 B1 20000818; JP 2000024846 A 20000125

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040824

2004-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040211

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2002-02-20 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20000512;SI PAYMENT 20000512

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO PAYMENT 20000512;SI PAYMENT 20000512

2001-05-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 25B 5/12 A

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000512

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI