Global Patent Index - EP 0967087 A3

EP 0967087 A3 2001-05-30 - Support for an ink-jet recording material

Title (en)

Support for an ink-jet recording material

Title (de)

Träger für ein Tintenstrahl-Aufzeichnungsmaterial

Title (fr)

Support pour un matériau pour l'enregistrement par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0967087 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99111205 A

Priority

DE 19828532 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967087A2] Substrate for inkjet printing material comprises base paper with a coating containing barium sulfate and thermoplastic micro balloons on at least one side.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41M 5/50 (2006.01); B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/5218 (2013.01); B41M 5/506 (2013.01); B41M 5/508 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 2205/38 (2013.01); Y10T 428/254 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31993 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0742486 A1 19961113 - SCHOELLER FELIX JUN FOTO [DE]
  • [A] US 3669899 A 19720613 - VASSILIADES ANTHONY E, et al
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2000, no. 02 29 February 2000 (2000-02-29)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199126, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A97, AN 1991-188729, XP002164035

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967087 A2 19991229; EP 0967087 A3 20010530; EP 0967087 B1 20030820; AT 247562 T 20030915; DE 19828532 A1 19991230; DE 19828532 C2 20011206; DK 0967087 T3 20031201; ES 2205639 T3 20040501; JP 2000033771 A 20000202; JP 4271781 B2 20090603; PT 967087 E 20031128; US 6524696 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160609

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170103

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160609

2017-01-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906640

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150101

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-01-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150101

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130619

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-05-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110610

2013-04-17 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130417

2012-08-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: SCHOELLER TECHNOCELL GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: FELIX SCHOELLER JR. FOTO- UND SPEZIALPAPIERE GMBH & CO. KG, 49086 OSNABRUECK, DE

- Document: DE 59906640

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-08-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906640

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20120627

2012-06-27 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59906640

- Representative's name: COHAUSZ & FLORACK PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

2012-03-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 247562 T

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110609

2011-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FELIX *SCHOELLER JR FOTO- UND SPEZIALPAPIERE G.M.B

- Effective date: 20110630

2010-10-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100611

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100614

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100615

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20100621

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-02-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061211

2007-01-29 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060610

2005-06-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050615

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-14 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050614

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-05-25 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050525

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205639 T3

2003-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-12-01 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906640 P 20030925

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010712

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI