Global Patent Index - EP 0967132 A3

EP 0967132 A3 2000-07-19 - Railway vehicle

Title (en)

Railway vehicle

Title (de)

Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 0967132 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810502 A

Priority

DE 19828458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967132A2] The rail vehicle has two buffers (1) at each end, each with a beating surface (2). The beating surfaces (2) of all four buffers (1) are formed by a plastics wearing plate (3). The wearing plate (3) is rectangular, with a horizontal longitudinal center axis, mounted to the domed buffer head (4) and secured by screw bolts (8) at the edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61G 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61G 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61G 11/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967132 A2 19991229; EP 0967132 A3 20000719; DE 19828458 A1 19991230

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-09-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030723

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR IT LI NL SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI