Global Patent Index - EP 0967154 B1

EP 0967154 B1 2000-12-06 - Method of attaching a liner bag in a container

Title (en)

Method of attaching a liner bag in a container

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Befestigung von Behälter-Einstellsäcken

Title (fr)

Procédé de fixation d'un sac de garniture dans un conteneur

Publication

EP 0967154 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103996 A

Priority

DE 19826331 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967154A1] The open end of the inserted plastic sack (2) is inverted on the outside over the cylindrical opening. The open end is fastened in place by an elastic O ring and a clamping (3) ring over it. The rim of the container (1) has an annular ridge and 0-ring. A lid can be fixed on the annular ridge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 25/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 25/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19826331 A1 19991216; EP 0967154 A1 19991229; EP 0967154 B1 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2002-03-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 4

2001-11-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-06-06 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20001206

2001-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-01-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900020 20010111

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-12-06 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-12-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000112

1999-12-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990311

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI