Global Patent Index - EP 0967313 A3

EP 0967313 A3 2000-11-08 - Method and band for making quick overlockings with an improved alignment

Title (en)

Method and band for making quick overlockings with an improved alignment

Title (de)

Verfahren zum schnelles Ansetzen eines Bundes an den Rand eines Gestricks mit verbesserter Ausrichtung und Bund dazu

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le montage rapide d'une bande au bord d'un tricot avec alignement simplifié et bande pour la mise en oeuvre du procédé

Publication

EP 0967313 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200004 A

Priority

IT MI981380 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967313A2] A method of making quick overlockings comprises the steps of manufacturing a band with at least one course of the knitted fabric made of an elastic yarn for producing a fold along said one course; folding back the band along the fold for juxtaposing it with a knitted element to which it is to be applied; sewing knitted element and edge close to the elastic course. In addition, in accordance with the invention, a band for quick overlocking is provided for being folded back to form at least one fold (15) along which it is to be sewn to a knitted element (12) to be trimmed therewith. At the fold position, the band is formed with a course (14) of knitted stitches made of an elastic yarn so as to promote folding. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/14; D05B 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/18 (2006.01); D04B 1/22 (2006.01); D05B 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/18 (2013.01); D04B 1/22 (2013.01); D05B 35/062 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967313 A2 19991229; EP 0967313 A3 20001108; IT 1301732 B1 20000707; IT MI981380 A1 19991217

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20031117

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030220

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES GB PT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB PT

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI