Global Patent Index - EP 0967314 A3

EP 0967314 A3 2000-11-08 - Method and tubular band with a separable portion for carrying out quick overlocking

Title (en)

Method and tubular band with a separable portion for carrying out quick overlocking

Title (de)

Schlauchförmiger Bund mit einem trennbaren Teil und verfahren zum Ansetzen des Bundes an den Rand eines Gestricks

Title (fr)

Bande tubulaire avec une portion séparable et procédé pour son montage au bord d'un tricot

Publication

EP 0967314 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200007 A

Priority

IT MI981379 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967314A2] A method of making quick overlockings comprises the steps of manufacturing a band with at least one tubular portion in which at least two courses of the knitted fabric are made of a yarn capable of being melted upon increasing of its temperature beyond a predetermined value; folding back the band for obtaining a loop along the band itself with the two courses of meltable yarn disposed on opposite walls of the loop; inserting an edge of the knitted fabric to be trimmed into the loop; sewing the band to the edge in such a manner that the stitching does not affect the loop bottom included between the two courses of meltable yarn; heating the band beyond the melting temperature of the meltable yarn so as to separate the loop bottom from the rest of the band; slipping off the loop bottom from the band inside. The invention also relates to a tubular band intended to be folded for receiving the edge of the knitted fabric to which it is to be sewn and formed with the at least two spaced apart courses made of a meltable yarn. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 1/16; D05B 35/06; D05B 37/10; D06H 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 1/16 (2006.01); D05B 35/06 (2006.01); D05B 37/10 (2006.01); D06H 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06H 7/225 (2013.01); D04B 1/16 (2013.01); D05B 35/062 (2013.01); D05B 37/10 (2013.01); D10B 2401/041 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967314 A2 19991229; EP 0967314 A3 20001108; EP 0967314 B1 20030820; AU 723375 B2 20000824; AU 9698498 A 20000217; BR 9900049 A 20000222; ES 2204055 T3 20040416; IT 1301731 B1 20000707; IT MI981379 A1 19991217

INPADOC legal status


2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040102

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2204055

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-01-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040120

2004-01-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040103

2004-01-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040102

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB PT

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES GB PT

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010507

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES GB PT

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI