Global Patent Index - EP 0967316 A3

EP 0967316 A3 2000-07-19 - Drive for a sewing machine, in particular an industrial sewing machine

Title (en)

Drive for a sewing machine, in particular an industrial sewing machine

Title (de)

Antrieb für eine Nähmaschine, insbesondere eine Industrienähmaschine

Title (fr)

Entraînement pour une machine à coudre, en particulier une machine à coudre industrielle

Publication

EP 0967316 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99109421 A

Priority

DE 19827846 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967316A2] The drive system for a sewing machine, and especially an industrial sewing machine where each needle shaft (1) has a direct electromagnetic drive, has a number of magnets (2) fitted to the needle shaft (1). The successive magnets have an opposing magnetism. A number of coils (9) are separated from the magnets by air gaps, with the pole gaps matching the magnet (2) intervals. In the drive system for a sewing machine the energizing of the coils (9) is controlled to give the needle shaft (1) a reciprocating up and down movement according to the required speed and acceleration profile. The durations of the needle shaft movements match the movements of the looper, with an angular synchronization where the thread is caught. The energizing of the coils (9) is controlled to give the needle shaft (1) an increased kinetic energy on piercing and penetrating the fabric work piece. The lower shaft is driven by an induction motor. At the direction change points of the needle shaft movements, the braking energy is stored in an intermediate circuit, and especially an intermediate condenser, to be converted into kinetic energy on the new movement direction. The needle shaft (1) is at least partially supported by a magnet mounting. The upper magnet mounting is formed by a linear drive (15) with a mechanical holding brake which grips the needle shaft (1) when the power supply is disconnected, and releases it when the power is restored. The linear motor is divided into an upper and lower section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D05B 69/10; D05B 55/14; H02K 41/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D05B 55/14 (2006.01); D05B 69/10 (2006.01); H02K 41/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02K 41/031 (2013.01); D05B 55/14 (2013.01); D05B 69/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967316 A2 19991229; EP 0967316 A3 20000719; EP 0967316 B1 20030730; DE 19827846 A1 19991230; DE 19827846 C2 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130511

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130511

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130511

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120521

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-07-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-05-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-07-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

2003-07-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020524

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001212

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI