Global patent index - EP 0967323 A3

EP 0967323 A3 2000-01-05 - Twin-wire former

Title (en)

Twin-wire former

Title (de)

Doppelsiebformer

Title (fr)

Section de formage à deux toiles

Publication

EP 0967323 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101848 A

Priority

DE 19828237 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967323A2] The double-fourdrinier section of a papermaking machine, has a lateral support bar (9) which applies an underpressure to the outer fourdrinier (11). The support bar (9) has a sliding surface (9a) in contact with the outer fourdrinier (11), followed by a foil surface (9b) in the direction of fourdrinier travel, which diverges from the fourdrinier surface to create an underpressure. The sliding surface (9a) is pressed against the outer fourdrinier (11) with a pliable pressure. As seen in cross section through the bar (9), the downstream section is supported by a swivel (7), while the upstream zone is held by a pliable setting unit such as a pneumatic hose (6). The gap can be varied between the swivel (7) and the outer fourdrinier (11), and the angle between the foil surface (9b) and the outer fourdrinier (11) can be set to give the required level of underpressure. The position of the support system can be varied parallel to the direction of fourdrinier travel, as a support shoe or suction box and the like which is pressed pliably against the outer fourdrinier. The support unit (9) is in the loop of the lower fourdrinier (11) and the roller (14) to form the wet pulp web within the loop of the upper fourdrinier (12). The two fourdriniers (11,12) can run upwards, from below, between the web forming roller (14) and the support (9), or downwards from above.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967323 A2 19991229; EP 0967323 A3 20000105; EP 0967323 B1 20030102; AT 230454 T 20030115; DE 19828237 A1 19991230; US 6254727 B1 20010703

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110802

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110129

2011-12-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59903896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110802

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110128

2011-11-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110128

2011-09-20 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100114

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031003

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59903896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20030206

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 230454

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20030115

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020415

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI