Global Patent Index - EP 0967324 A3

EP 0967324 A3 2000-02-23 - Process for smoothing a paper web

Title (en)

Process for smoothing a paper web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Glätten einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Procédé pour le lissage d' une bande de papier

Publication

EP 0967324 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110294 A

Priority

DE 19828156 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0967324A2] The assembly (12) to polish the surface of a moving web (14), especially of paper or cardboard, has at least one polishing zone (10) formed by a roller (16) with bend adjustment and a soft or elastic surface and a hard and smooth continuous belt (18) with high thermal conductivity. The assembly comprises at least one polishing zone (10) and a hard and smooth continuous belt (18) with high thermal conductivity. A support surface (20) is within the belt (18) loop, with inner heating for the heat to be transferred to the belt (18) and build up a hydrodynamic lubricating liquid film (30) between the support surface (20) and the belt (18). The inner surface of the continuous belt (18) is subjected to a hot gas medium, and especially steam, to give a hydrodynamic lubrication liquid film (30) through the condensation of the medium. The steam is applied to the belt (18) before the support surface (20) in the direction (L) of web travel. The belt heater (28) delivers the hot steam to the belt (18) in controlled zones, across the web width, through a zone-controlled steamer or steam blower box. The support surface (20) is composed of at least one support unit (22), which is cooled at least at the support surface (20) zone to assist the formation of condensation. The support surface (20) has a support unit (22) which is of a high stiffness, and especially as a shoe unit (22). The continuous belt (18) is of metal. The belt (18) travels over at least one belt guide roller (24) and/or at least one tensioning roller (26). A unit (32) to extract the condensation is within the belt (18) loop, after the support surface (20) in the direction (L) of web travel. The condensation extractor has at least one takeoff gutter and preferably a scraper. The extractor (32) has at least one suction extraction unit. The zone within the belt (18) loop is maintained at the prevailing ambient atmospheric pressure. A single hard continuous belt (18) can work with a number of rollers (16) to form a number of polishing zones (10), for the web (14) to be polished on a different side at each polishing zone (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0967324 A2 19991229; EP 0967324 A3 20000223; EP 0967324 B1 20021106; DE 19828156 A1 19991230; US 6182564 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110527

2011-12-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903293

2011-11-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903293

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100521

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100514

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-19 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2004-05-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040527

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030522

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030422

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903293 20021212

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2002-06-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020417

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI